ACOSTA v. LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Defendant: WILLIAM PFLUMM and LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02936
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (EPSTEIN, MATTHEW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. WILLIAM PFLUMM waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (EPSTEIN, MATTHEW)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 7/8/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/8/19. 7/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
July 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. (ahf)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC., WILLIAM PFLUMM. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/8/2019 (ahf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC., WILLIAM PFLUMM, filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACOSTA v. LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: MATTHEW R. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PFLUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCASTER CONTAINER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?