BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. v. E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC and DEAN CALTON
Case Number: 5:2019cv03112
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. A Telephone Conference was held on 9/12/2019 and not placed on the record. (DT)
September 12, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/1/2019 03:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. (er, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER CURRENTLY IN EFFECT SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL OCTOBER 12, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2019, AT 3:30 P.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A CALL-IN NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE PRIOR TO THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON SEPTEMBER 30, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/12/19. 9/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(er, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/26/2019 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE.(cms)
August 13, 2019 PLAINTIFF'S INJUNCTION BOND TO DEFENDANT in the amount of $ 200,000.00 with HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY as surety posted by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. (va, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 12, 2019, AT 3:00 P.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE A CALL-IN NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE TO THE COURT AND DEFENDANTS BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2019, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/13/19. 8/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(er, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER CURRENTLY IN EFFECT SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT UNTIL SEPTEMBER 13, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/12/19. 8/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/MEDIATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/12/19. 8/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Telephone Conference held on 8/12/19. A telephone conference was held and not placed on the record. (mas, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC..(SIMMONS, JOHN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #13 Transcript - PDF. 8/7/19 Entered and Copies Emailed. (mbh, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 Transcript of Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on July 31, 2019 before Judge Jeffrey L. Schmehl. Court Reporter/Transcriber Hwang Transcription. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019. (mbh, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, AUGUST 12, 2019, AT 11:30 A.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL PROVIDE A CALL-IN NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE TO THE COURT AND DEFENDANTS BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON AUGUST 9, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/6/19. 8/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(er, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/19. Court Reporter: esr. (er, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF BRENTWOOD'S TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/31/19.7/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(er, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Telephone Conference held on 7/19/19. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 31, 2019, AT 1:30 P.M., IN THE COURTROOM OF THE UNDERSIGNED, THE MADISON BUILDING, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE THE DEFENDANTS WITH A COPY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/22/19. 7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. re: Richard A. Mayer served Summons and Complaint upon DEAN CALTON, DEAN CALTON by Personally served. DEAN CALTON served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; DEAN CALTON served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (SIMMONS, JOHN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. re: Richard A. Mayer served Summons and Complaint upon E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC, E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC by Personally served. E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (SIMMONS, JOHN)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 7/18/2019 THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, JULY 19, 2019 AT 11:15AM. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(DT)
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to DEAN CALTON, E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/18/2019 (ahf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS JAMES BUTLER on behalf of BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUTLER, DENNIS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH A. JONES on behalf of BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(JONES, KEITH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC..Brief in Support.(SIMMONS, JOHN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEAN CALTON, E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13675239.), filed by BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F, #2 Designation Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form)(SIMMONS, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC. v. E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-POLYTECH MFG SYS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN CALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENTWOOD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: KEITH A. JONES
Represented By: JOHN D. SIMMONS
Represented By: DENNIS JAMES BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?