SHAY v. GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC.
Plaintiff: TAYLOR M. SHAY
Defendant: GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03157
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAYLOR M. SHAY. GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (MOBILIO, MATTHEW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL EZRA COHEN on behalf of GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC. with Certificate of Service(COHEN, SAMUEL)
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC. 1 Original Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/19/19 (er, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC. ( APE005182 Filing fee $ 400.), filed by TAYLOR M. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, ) Modified on 7/19/2019 (er, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAY v. GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR M. SHAY
Represented By: MATTHEW MOBILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG'S DIESEL SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL EZRA COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?