UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC. v. ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC.
Defendant: ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03218
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Default Entered (amas)
August 23, 2019 DEFAULT BY ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (amas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Default UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC. against ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default, #2 Certificate of Service)(CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FRANCIS A. CAMAROTA re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA AS STATUTORY REGISTERED AGENT FOR THE DEFENDANT by ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION PERMITTED BY FLA. STAT. 48.151 on 07/31/2019 (CAMAROTA, FRANCIS)
July 24, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
July 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC.. (ahf)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC..(ahf)
July 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/25/2019 (ahf)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200912.), filed by UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC..(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC. v. ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES, FOR THE USE OF NRB (USA), INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS A. CAMAROTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?