MARTINEZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: GILBERT M. MARTINEZ
Defendant: HON. CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, HON. MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, HON. JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, HON. ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HON. DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, HON. EDWARD G. SMITH, HON. ROSEMARY S. POOLER and FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Case Number: 5:2019cv03708
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 9/17/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) AND MOTION TO RECUSE (ECF NO. 6) IT IS ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN IFP IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME SO THAT THE COURT MAY SCREEN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICH IS NOW THE OPERATIVE PLEADING IN THIS MATTER, IN DUE COURSE. MARTINEZ'S PENDING MOTIONS WILL ALSO BE HANDLED IN DUE COURSE. TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FRCP 4M IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE 90 DAYS FOLLOWING ANY DECISION BY THE COURT THAT THE CLAIMS IN THIS CASE SHOULD PROCEED. THE MOTION TO RECUSE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/17/2019. 9/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (DT)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO RECUSE, FILED BY GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(amas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by GILBERT M. MARTINEZ.(DT)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)
August 16, 2019 Jury Trial Demanded by Pro Se Plaintiff GILBERT M. MARTINEZ. (DT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded by Pro Se Plaintiff Gilbert M. Martinez against MICHEAL A. CHAGARES, CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON, ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF, ROSEMARY S. POOLER, EDWARD G. SMITH, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form Case Management Track Form)(DT) Modified on 8/19/2019 (dt, ).(envelope attached)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. MARTINEZ TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. CHRISTOPHER F. DRONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. MICHEAL A. CHAGARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. JAMES KNOLL GARDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. ROSLYNN MAUSKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. DEBRA ANN LIVINGSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. EDWARD G. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. ROSEMARY S. POOLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT M. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?