CMH HOMES, INC. v. PIZZARO
Plaintiff: CMH HOMES, INC.
Defendant: BRANDON PIZZARO
Case Number: 5:2019cv03727
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/11/2019. 10/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by BRANDON PIZZARO.(MOONEY, JODY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRANDON PIZZARO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MOONEY, JODY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JODY A. MOONEY on behalf of BRANDON PIZZARO with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MOONEY, JODY)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 55 LETTER: A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S RECORDS SHOWS THAT A PLEADING HAS NOT BEEN FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. IF SUCH A PLEADING IS NOT FILED BY THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 18, 2019, YOU MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 55 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. IF THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS NOT FILED BY OCTOBER 25, 2019, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. COPIES EMAILED AND MAILED. (sme, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMH HOMES, INC. re: Kenneth Browning served Summons and Complaint upon BRANDON PIZZARO by Personal. BRANDON PIZZARO served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (SACAVAGE, ALEXANDRA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA E. SACAVAGE on behalf of CMH HOMES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(SACAVAGE, ALEXANDRA)
August 19, 2019 1 Original Summons Issued as to BRANDON PIZZARO forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 8/19/19. (rf, )
August 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CMH HOMES, INC.. (rf, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Berkshire Hathaway Inc. by CMH HOMES, INC..(HULL, KANDICE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRANDON PIZZARO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13742243.), filed by CMH HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form)(HULL, KANDICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMH HOMES, INC. v. PIZZARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMH HOMES, INC.
Represented By: KANDICE KERWIN HULL
Represented By: ALEXANDRA E. SACAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON PIZZARO
Represented By: JODY A. MOONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?