CAPOBIANCO v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LISA CAPOBIANCO
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv04272
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE TO HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/10/2019. 10/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by LISA CAPOBIANCO.. (SAVOY, ROBERT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, )
September 23, 2019 3 Summonses & Copies of Complaint Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 3 Forwarded To: USM (1) & USA (1) on 9/24/19. (va, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 9/24/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (va, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS TO USM AND SERVE US ATTY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/23/19. 9/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(kw, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL (IFP PENDING), filed by PLFF LISA CAPOBIANCO.(kw, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY PLFF LISA CAPOBIANCO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPOBIANCO v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA CAPOBIANCO
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?