TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC v. ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC
Plaintiff: TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC
Defendant: ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04303
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC.(HARTMAN, KATHARINE)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC.(HARTMAN, KATHARINE)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST IS APPROVED AND GRANTED IN PART AND DISAPPROVED AND DENIED IN PART; AND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ONLY, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE, IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 14, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/4/19. 10/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/4/19. 10/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON TO HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/03/2019. 10/03/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. BIEMER on behalf of ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC with Certificate of Service(BIEMER, THOMAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHARINE VIRGINIA HARTMAN on behalf of ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC with Certificate of Service(HARTMAN, KATHARINE)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Russo re: served Summons and Complaint upon Aluminum Shapes, LLC by Person in Charge, Jeanette Rivera on 09/24/2019, answer due 10/15/19. (D'AMICO, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/3/2019 (tjd).
September 18, 2019 1 Original Summons Issued as to ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 09/18/2019. (DT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TALEN ENERGY CORPORATION for TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC. by TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC.(DT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APE005297.), filed by TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC.(DT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC v. ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALEN ENERGY MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH S. D'AMICO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALUMINUM SHAPES, LLC
Represented By: KATHARINE VIRGINIA HARTMAN
Represented By: THOMAS S. BIEMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?