WELSH v. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Plaintiff: JESSE WELSH
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04620
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 8) IS DENIED AS MOOT. BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES, THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/28/19.10/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (TWILLA, DANIEL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH. Telephone Conference held on 10/24/19. A telephone conference was held before Judge Smith. (mas, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 10/11/2019 THAT AFTER A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERNCE IN THIS MATTER ON THURSDAY, OCTOBER 24, 2019, AT 11:45AM. COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/11/19.10/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH Telephone Conference held on 10/11/19 (dt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. with Jury Demand and Cert of Service(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of JESSE WELSH (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS MATTER ON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 11, 2019, AT 10:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/9/19. 10/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. for PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO..(amas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. from NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number C48-CV-19-08180. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 204722) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELSH v. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. TWILLA
Represented By: KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER
Represented By: DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE WELSH
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Represented By: MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?