WOLFE v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TARA WOLFE
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv05005
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLFF IS DEEMED TO HAVE CONSENTED TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE & THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(c), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/6/19. 12/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE & FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE & THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 636(c), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/20/19. 11/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S. Marshal, re: served summons and complaint upon DEFT COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY and U.S. Attorney General by FedEx on 11/12/19. (kw, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Standing Procedural Order. 10/29/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kw, )
October 29, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 10/29/19. (kw, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE E.D. OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES & THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i), ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 10/29/19.10/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent)(er, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by TARA WOLFE. (IFP PENDING) (er, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by TARA WOLFE. DECLARATION.(er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLFE v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA WOLFE
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?