Sciumbata et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Sciumbata and Teresa Sciumbata
Defendant: ETHICON, LLC, ETHICON INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Case Number: 5:2019cv05185
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS' SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, #2 Exhibit A)(CLARKE, CHRISTINE)
December 27, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata.Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Def Stmt of Facts, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E - Confidential Document, #8 Exhibit F - Confidential Document, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(CLARKE, CHRISTINE)
December 23, 2019 Filing 97 Reply in Support re #93 MOTION for Summary Judgment CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (FLYNN, MOLLY) Modified on 12/31/2019 (tjd).
December 16, 2019 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L)(CLARKE, CHRISTINE)
December 4, 2019 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. Settlement Conference held on 12/2/19. A telephonic settlement conference was conducted in this case. (mas, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 94 Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion re #92 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiffs Motion for Substitution of Bankruptcy Trustee as Plaintiff / Real Party-in-Interest filed by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (FLYNN, MOLLY) Modified on 12/5/2019 (tjd).
December 2, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q)(FLYNN, MOLLY)
November 29, 2019 Filing 92 Plaintiffs Motion for Substitution of Bankruptcy Trustee as Plaintiff / Real Party-in-Interest filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata.Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit)(CLARKE, CHRISTINE) Modified on 12/2/2019 (tjd).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW CHRISTY D. JONES, KARI L. SUTHERLAND, AND WILLIAM M. GAGE OF BUTLER SNOW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. MS. JONES, MS. SUTHERLAND, AND MR. GAGE ARE HEREBY WITHDRAWN AND THEY ARE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CM/ECF SYSTEM FOR THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/26/19.11/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(er, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH E. O'NEIL on behalf of ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'NEIL, JOSEPH)
November 19, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christy D. Jones, Kari L. Sutherland, and William M. Gage of Butler Snow as Counsel of Record filed by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service.(FLYNN, MOLLY)
November 15, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON Withdraw the Appearance of Ms. Jones, Ms. Sutherland, and Mr. Gage be removed from ECF notifications for this action (FLYNN, MOLLY)
November 14, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ on behalf of Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata (GOMEZ, CHRISTOPHER)
November 7, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/2/2019 02:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/19/2020 09:30 AM IN Allentown BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. (er, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 19, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, IN SUITE 4401, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PA. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT YOU PARK AT THE PUBLIC PARKING GARAGE LOCATED AT 6TH & WALNUT STREET. THERE IS AN ENTRANCE ON BOTH WALNUT AND 6TH STREETS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/7/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 11/7/2019 (er, ).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, DECEMBER 2, 2019, AT 2:30 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/7/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(er, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT HIS EARLIEST CONVENIENCE. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/5/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/25/2020 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; JURY SELECTION SET FOR 3/30/2020 09:00AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; MOTIONS DUE BY 12/2/2019; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/5/19. 11/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT THE PENDING MOTIONS AT ECF NOS. #37 , #40 , #43 , #58 , AND #60 , ARE DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A SEPARATE SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/5/19.11/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 81 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-07037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 26, 2019 Filing 80 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4312), #2 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4480), #3 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4626), #4 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3626) Part 1, #5 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3626) Part 2, #6 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3630), #7 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3767) Part 1, #8 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3767) Part 2, #9 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3767) Part 3, #10 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3767) Part 4, #11 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3855), #12 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4321), #13 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4485), #14 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4630), #15 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2817), #16 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2818), #17 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2931), #18 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3024), #19 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4374), #20 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4375), #21 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4543), #22 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4550), #23 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4552), #24 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4637), #25 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4355), #26 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4361), #27 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4554), #28 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4625))(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2019 Filing 79 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2205) Part 1, #2 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2205) Part 2, #3 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2205) Part 3, #4 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2206), #5 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2287) Part 1, #6 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2287) Part 2, #7 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2297), #8 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2825), #9 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2826), #10 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3053), #11 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4362), #12 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4499), #13 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4600), #14 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2060), #15 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2065), #16 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2134), #17 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2232), #18 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (2910), #19 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4358), #20 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4483), #21 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (4615), #22 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3619) Part 1, #23 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3619) Part 2, #24 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3621), #25 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3790) Part 1, #26 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3790) Part 2, #27 Exhibit ECF #78 Continued (3790) Part 3)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2019 Filing 78 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238), #2 Exhibit (239), #3 Exhibit (241), #4 Exhibit (262), #5 Exhibit (263), #6 Exhibit (2033), #7 Exhibit (2036), #8 Exhibit (2155) Part 1, #9 Exhibit (2155) Part 2, #10 Exhibit (2223), #11 Exhibit (4335), #12 Exhibit (4497), #13 Exhibit (4579), #14 Exhibit (2050), #15 Exhibit (2051), #16 Exhibit (2159), #17 Exhibit (2230), #18 Exhibit (4338), #19 Exhibit (4522), #20 Exhibit (4583), #21 Exhibit (2022), #22 Exhibit (2024), #23 Exhibit (2921), #24 Exhibit (2982), #25 Exhibit (4342), #26 Exhibit (4502))(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying as moot #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC for Leave to File an Early Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment re Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel and Lack of Standing. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/8/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exh 1-List of Cases, #2 Exh 2- Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2668 in MDL 2327 on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge) filed at ECF No. 2642 in MDL 2327 on 8/24/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (DaubertMotion re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2710 in MDL 2327 on 9/01/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases as identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Elaine Duncan, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert motion re: Elaine Duncan, M.D.) entered as ECF No. 2656 in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert motion re: Elaine Duncan, M.D.) is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Timothy Ulatowski, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Timothy Ulatowski, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2649 in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Timothy Ulatowski, M.D.) is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/26/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.) filing at ECF No. 2724 in MDL 2327 on 9/02/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/26/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Nicole Fleischmann, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Nicole Fleischmann, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2696 in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Nicole Fleischmann, M.D.) is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/26/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Douglas Grier, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Douglas Grier, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2703 in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Douglas Grier, M.D.) is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/25/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Bobby Shull, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Bobby Shull, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2711 in MDL 2327 on 9/19/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 5 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/24/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
December 18, 2017 INCORRECT ENTRY. (Modified on 12/18/2017 to remove entry filed in the incorrect member civil action; entry correctly entered in MDL 2327) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER This order denying the Motion by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply With the Court's ECF No. 4714 Order is not intended to resolve outstanding issues regarding the reliability and admissibility of the article "Oxidation and Degradation of Polypropylene Transvaginal Mesh"; this order simply memorializes the undersigned's conclusion that Plaintiffs complied with the court's order compelling them, through Dr. Guelcher, to collect any remaining facts and data in the possession of the co-investigators and supply it to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/15/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 5 cases) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to Take Judicial Notice of the Reopening of Plaintiffs' Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER The Motion by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Discovery or, in the Alternative, to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony filed in MDL 2327 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part; Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to collect and produce to the defendants certain information set forth herein pertaining to the article entitled "Oxidation and Degradation of Polypropylene Transvaginal Mesh," relied upon by Dr. Guelcher; With respect to Defendants' motion that they be permitted to take a supplemental deposition of Dr. Guelcher to question him about the raw data, the motion is DENIED. Furthermore, Defendants' motion to preclude Dr. Guelcher from offering opinions or testimony based upon the above-mentioned article is likewise DENIED, as it is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/26/2017. (cc: attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 5 Cases) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in #53 Opposition by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based Upon Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel, or, in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Lack of Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clarke, Christine) (Modified on 9/19/2017 to add link to #53 opposition) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiffs friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 56 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #54 Memorandum In Opposition. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata for Responses to Requests for Admissions and to Requests for Production of Documents. (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata in opposition to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based Upon Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel, or, in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Lack of Standing (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 53 OPPOSITION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based Upon Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel, or, in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Lack of Standing (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #50 Response In Opposition. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata in support of #50 Opposition. (Clarke, Christine) (Modified on 8/30/2017 to correct link and to convert event to memorandum in support) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 50 OPPOSITION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to #43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #47 Response In Opposition. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata in opposition to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 47 OPPOSITION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to Extend the Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Responses and Defendants' Replies to Responses to Dispositive Motions by 14 days; Plaintiffs have until 9/05/2017 to File Any Responses to Defendants' Dispositive Motions, and Defendants have until 9/12/2017 to File Any Replies. All other deadlines set out in PTO # 248 remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/21/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata to Extend the Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Responses and Defendants' Replies to Responses to Dispositive Motions by 14 days (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Clarke, Christine) (Modified on 8/16/2017 to remove links #40 motion and #41 memorandum in support) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PRETRIAL ORDER # 268 (Motion for a Protective Order and Motion for De Bene Esse Deposition) The Motion by Ethicon, Inc. Johnson & Johnson for Protective Order Precluding De Bene Esse Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Scott A. Guelcher, PH.D. and Motion for De Bene Esse Deposition of Scott A. Guelcher, PH.D. filed in MDL 2327 are DENIED as to the motion for a protective order and GRANTED as to the motion for leave to conduct a de bene esse deposition of Dr. Guelcher. Signed by Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/9/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 5 Cases) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment Based Upon Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel, or, in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Lack of Standing (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRETRIAL ORDER # 267 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) Pursuant to PTO # 117 filed in MDL 2327, the Court granted Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend First Amended Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand and Amended Master Short Form Complaint to the extent it sought to remove defendant Ethicon, LLC from the Master Long Form Complaint and Amended Short Form Complaint and provided that the Court would initiate a show cause process regarding Ethicon, LLC in cases filed prior to the date of the Order; the cases identified as part of Wave discovery and included in the attached Exhibit A all pre-date PTO # 117 and name Ethicon, LLC as a defendant; the parties have agreed to dismiss Ethicon, LLC without prejudice from the cases identified on Exhibit A; it is ORDERED that Ethicon, LLC shall be dismissed without prejudice from each case identified on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/4/2017. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 36 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC to #35 Response In Opposition. (Flynn, Molly) (Modified on 7/25/2017 to add party filer) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata in opposition to #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC for Leave to File an Early Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment re Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel and Lack of Standing (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBER by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teresa Sciumbata and Giuseppe Sciumbata (Flynn, Molly) (Modified on 7/19/2017 to add party filers)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 6, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, LLC for Leave to File an Early Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment re Bankruptcy Judicial Estoppel and Lack of Standing (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Merk, Melissa) (Modified on 7/6/2017 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Jaime B. Long on 7/14/2017 at 1:00 pm (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 30 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dominic Cammarano III, M.D. on 7/18/17 at 1:00 PM (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 26 STIPULATION re: independent medical examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teresa Sciumbata (Flynn, Molly) (Modified on 5/23/2017 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christine V. Clarke on behalf of Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata. (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Teresa Sciumbata on April 25, 2017 at 10:30 AM (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa A. Graff on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Graff, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dominic Cammarano on March 8, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER # 248 (Docket Control Order - Wave 5 Cases) The cases attached hereto as Exhibit A will be known as "Ethicon Wave 5 cases" and the following deadlines apply: Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/22/2017, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/22/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests is 6/05/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 5/22/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 6/19/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/05/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery is 7/19/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 8/08/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/22/2017, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 8/29/2017, Filing of Daubert motions due by 8/15/2017, Responses to Daubert motions due by 8/29/2017, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 9/05/2017. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the courts attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/28/2017, any response is due 7/12/2017 and any reply is due 7/19/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 6/30/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/10/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/21/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 5 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Order to Show Cause re: Why Claims Should Not be Dismissed Based Upon Lack of Standing and/or Judicial Estoppel. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 11, 2013 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Order to Show Cause re: Why Claims Should Not be Dismissed Based Upon Lack of Standing and/or Judicial Estoppel. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 11, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Order to Show Cause re: Why Claims Should Not be Dismissed Based Upon Lack of Standing and/or Judicial Estoppel. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 5, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 2, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 26, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 6, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 15, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, LLC. Ethicon, LLC served on 12/26/2012, answer due 1/16/2013. Summons served on scott lascala. (Tiger, Michelle) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 20, 2012 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #7 Proposed Summons Submitted. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 19, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Giuseppe Sciumbata, Teresa Sciumbata for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Short Form Complaint (Tiger, Michelle) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 11, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 11, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 11, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 30, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Giuseppe Sciumbata and Teresa Sciumbata for Ethicon, Inc., re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for the defendant mailed to Lee B. Balefsky for service. (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 29, 2012 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 19 (Order Amending PTO # 16, Scheduling and Rescheduling Future Status Conferences) entered on 10/23/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2012 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2057010. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gjb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciumbata et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Sciumbata
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: MICHELLE L. TIGER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ
Represented By: CHRISTINE V. CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Sciumbata
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: MICHELLE L. TIGER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ
Represented By: CHRISTINE V. CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: SUSAN M. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC
Represented By: MELISSA A. MERK
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: SUSAN M. ROBINSON
Represented By: PHILIP J. COMBS
Represented By: KARI L. SUTHERLAND
Represented By: CHRISTY D. JONES
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: JOSEPH E. O'NEIL
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MELISSA A. MERK
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: WILLIAM M. GAGE
Represented By: DAVID B. THOMAS
Represented By: SUSAN M. ROBINSON
Represented By: PHILIP J. COMBS
Represented By: KARI L. SUTHERLAND
Represented By: CHRISTY D. JONES
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: JOSEPH E. O'NEIL
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?