THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY and DENNIS VOURDERIS
Defendant: GREE USA, INC., GE APPLIANCES and HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05295
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by GE APPLIANCES, GREE USA, INC., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC..(MALLON, GREGORY)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/6/20.1/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GE APPLIANCES, GREE USA, INC., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by PLFF THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(kw, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD A. SCHUSTER TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/19/19. 12/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Schuster by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13998351.). (ESTACIO, RICHARD)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV. 12(B)(2) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint (sent to court for filing))(ESTACIO, RICHARD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV. 12(B)(2) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by GE APPLIANCES, GREE USA, INC., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC..Certificate of Service, Memo of Law.(MALLON, GREGORY)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Nicole Mitry served Summons and Complaint upon GREE USA, INC. by Amber Smythe, registered agent, in person. GREE USA, INC. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (ESTACIO, RICHARD)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Terry Bumgardner re: served Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet for Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. upon Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. - Stefoni Murphy, Intake Specialist by Service Agent CT Corporation In Person on 11/25/19, answer due 12/16/19. (ESTACIO, RICHARD) Modified on 12/5/2019 (tjd).
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Terry Bumgardner re: served Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet for Defendant GE Appliances upon Stefoni Murphy, Intake Specialist by Service Agent CT Corporation In Person on 11/25/19, answer due 12/16/2019. (ESTACIO, RICHARD) Modified on 12/5/2019 (tjd).
November 8, 2019 Three (3) Summons Issued as to GE APPLIANCES, GREE USA, INC., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.. Forwarded To: Richard A. Estacio on 11/12/19 (fdc, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GE APPLIANCES, GREE USA, INC., HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 206632.), filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GREE USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD A ESTACIO
Represented By: RICHARD A. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS VOURDERIS
Represented By: RICHARD A ESTACIO
Represented By: RICHARD A. SCHUSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE USA, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY M. MALLON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE APPLIANCES
Represented By: GREGORY M. MALLON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY M. MALLON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?