BEDOYA v. THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC.
Plaintiff: LUZ BEDOYA
Defendant: THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05432
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 25, 2020, AT 4:15 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EASTERLY, EDWARD)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of LUZ BEDOYA (LEASE, ADAM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LUZ BEDOYA. THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/18/2020. (KARPF, ARI)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. EASTERLY on behalf of THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EASTERLY, EDWARD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/21/19. 11/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
November 19, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/20/19 (mbh, )
November 19, 2019 Demand for Trial by Jury.(mbh, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13935850.), filed by LUZ BEDOYA.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEDOYA v. THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ BEDOYA
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: ADAM C. LEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THIRD STREET ALLIANCE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD J. EASTERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?