JONES v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JOHN MICHAEL JONES
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2020cv00318
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
January 21, 2020 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded 2 TO THE US MARSHALS AND 1 TO THE US ATTORNEY on 1/22/2020 (amas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Social Security Standing Procedural Order 1/22/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed.(amas)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE US MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/21/2020.1/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by JOHN MICHAEL JONES.(bw, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOHN MICHAEL JONES..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MICHAEL JONES
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?