DAVIS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: NICOLE LYNN DAVIS
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2020cv00454
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Nancy Berryhill via FEDEX on 2/13/20. FEDEX Tracking Sheet attached. (rf, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 2/13/20. FEDEX Tracking Sheet Attached. (rf, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/14/20. 2/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by NICOLE LYNN DAVIS.. (MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING Procedural Order 1/30/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed. (bw, )
January 29, 2020 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL AND 1 TO AUSA on 1/30/2020. (bw, )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. U.S. MARSHALS SHALL SERVE THE SUMMON AND COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/29/2020.1/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by NICOLE LYNN DAVIS.(bw, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NICOLE LYNN DAVIS..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE LYNN DAVIS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MARZZACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?