RAMOS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE NEREIDA RAMOS
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2020cv00929
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/28/2020. 3/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by ROCHELLE NEREIDA RAMOS.. (SILVER, JOSEPH)
February 24, 2020 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 1 TO US ATTORNEY 2 TO US MARSHAL on 3/24/2020 (sg, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Procedural Order 2/24/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed. (sg, )
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES FOR THE E.D.P.A. SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE US ATTORNEY FOR THE E.D.P.A.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/21/2020. 2/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by ROCHELLE NEREIDA RAMOS.(bw, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROCHELLE NEREIDA RAMOS..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMOS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE NEREIDA RAMOS
Represented By: JOSEPH B SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?