A HASHIM et al v. AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Plaintiff: JEHAN HASHIM A HASHIM, AHMED HASHIM A HASHIM, SARA HASHIM A HASHIM, LASMIS TALAL A GAZZAZ, ABDULRAHMAN HASHIM A HASHIM and MAJED HASHIM A HASHIM
Defendant: AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01213
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE #7 APPLICATION OF LINDA H. MARTIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/14/20.4/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE #8 APPLICATION OF SCOTT A. EISMAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/14/20.4/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Eisman, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14236034.) filed by AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC..Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURNS, GERALD)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Linda H. Martin, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14236001.) filed by AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC..Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURNS, GERALD)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW HOPE on behalf of AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HOPE, ANDREW)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. BURNS on behalf of AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BURNS, GERALD)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN THE UNDERSIGNED PARTIES THAT DEFENDANT WAS SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT ON MARCH 27, 2020, AND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO MAY 8, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/3/20. 4/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 4/6/2020 (tjd).
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER MORRIS MCCALL on behalf of LASMIS TALAL A GAZZAZ, ABDULRAHMAN HASHIM A HASHIM, AHMED HASHIM A HASHIM, JEHAN HASHIM A HASHIM, MAJED HASHIM A HASHIM, SARA HASHIM A HASHIM with Certificate of Service(MCCALL, PETER)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS by LASMIS TALAL A GAZZAZ, ABDULRAHMAN HASHIM A HASHIM, AHMED HASHIM A HASHIM, JEHAN HASHIM A HASHIM, MAJED HASHIM A HASHIM, SARA HASHIM A HASHIM. (rf, )
March 10, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 3/10/20.(rf, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE212222.), filed by MAJED HASHIM A HASHIM, LASMIS TALAL A GAZZAZ, AHMED HASHIM A HASHIM, SARA HASHIM A HASHIM, JEHAN HASHIM A HASHIM, ABDULRAHMAN HASHIM A HASHIM.(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/3/2020) (nd, ).
February 28, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 3/3/2020 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A HASHIM et al v. AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEHAN HASHIM A HASHIM
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED HASHIM A HASHIM
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA HASHIM A HASHIM
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASMIS TALAL A GAZZAZ
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABDULRAHMAN HASHIM A HASHIM
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAJED HASHIM A HASHIM
Represented By: TAREK F. ABDALLA
Represented By: PETER MORRIS MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Represented By: GERALD E. BURNS
Represented By: ANDREW HOPE
Represented By: SCOTT A. EISMAN
Represented By: LINDA H. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?