HART v. STONE et al
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN HART
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER STONE and EARL L. HENDERSON TRUCKING COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2020cv02779
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference to be conducted via telephone before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for MONDAY, AUGUST 10, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for all the parties will use dial in number 1-571-353-2300 and use pin 363 973 916# to enter the conference call.(sres, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EARL L. HENDERSON TRUCKING COMPANY.(KAELIN, JOHN)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses by EARL L. HENDERSON TRUCKING COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER STONE.(KAELIN, JOHN)
June 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to EARL L. HENDERSON TRUCKING COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER STONE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/11/2020 (bw, )
June 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KATHLEEN HART. (lisad, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT KATHLEEN HART against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14346536.), filed by KATHLEEN HART.(YOUNG, JONATHAN) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 Designation Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HART v. STONE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER STONE
Represented By: JOHN N. KAELIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL L. HENDERSON TRUCKING COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN N. KAELIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN HART
Represented By: JONATHAN B. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?