AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv03223
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/27/2020 (bw, )
July 23, 2020 Original record transferred to the District of District of Columbia via Interdistrict transfer system. (MDL 2925, cto-12). (tjd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) that Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Columbia for the reasons stated in the order 20, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Beryl A. Howell. (jaa, )
July 1, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.. (tjd)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC..(LIPUMA, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14392919.), filed by AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(LIPUMA, MICHAEL) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/2/2020) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL D. LIPUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?