ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN NUTONE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED and JAKEL, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 5:2020cv04013
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED AS AN ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 10/14/20. 10/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order via Stipulation filed by BROAN NUTONE, LLC, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, JAKEL, INCORPORATED..(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nortek, Inc. by BROAN NUTONE, LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by BROAN NUTONE, LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference to be conducted via telephone before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for TUESDAY, OCTOBER 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for all the parties will use dial in number 1-571-353-2300 and use pin 363 973 916# to enter the conference call.(sres, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE A review of the Court's records shows that a pleading has not been filed in the above-captioned action from Defendant, Broan Nutone, in response to the complaint, as required by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A response was due on or before September 23, 2020. Accordingly, you may file a request with the Clerk for entry of a default against this Defendant in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If the Request for Default is not filed by September 30, 2020, the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the above-named defendant for lack of prosecution. (sres, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Regal Beloit Corporation by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, JAKEL, INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, JAKEL, INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY re: Denise Fabela served Summons and Complaint upon BROAN NUTONE, LLC by Personal. BROAN NUTONE, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Motors Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 8/27/2020 (tjd).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 8/27/2020 (tjd).
August 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to BROAN NUTONE, LLC, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, JAKEL, INCORPORATED. E-mailed To: PATRICK A. HUGHES, ESQ. on 8/18/2020 (dmc, )
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (lisad, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROAN NUTONE, LLC, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED, JAKEL, INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14500609.), filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(HUGHES, PATRICK) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/18/2020) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN NUTONE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKEL, INCORPORATED
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK A. HUGHES
Represented By: RAYMOND E. MACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?