BODRE v. SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS
Plaintiff: CLEYVIS BODRE
Defendant: SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS
Case Number: 5:2020cv04040
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent UDG HEALTHCARE PLC, Corporate Parent UDG HEALTHCARE US HOLDINGS, INC, Corporate Parent UDG HEALTHCARE (US) HOLDINGS LTD. for SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS. by SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS.**(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #8 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**(tjd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS. (RODRIGUEZ, JOANNA) Modified on 10/16/2020 (tjd).
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS.(RODRIGUEZ, JOANNA)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARLA N. PRESLEY on behalf of SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS with Certificate of Service(PRESLEY, MARLA)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 15, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/16/20.9/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS.Certificate of Service.(RODRIGUEZ, JOANNA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA M. RODRIGUEZ on behalf of SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS with Certificate of Service(RODRIGUEZ, JOANNA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CLEYVIS BODRE re: Alan Focht served Summons and Complaint upon SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS by Hand delivery. SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (DION, SAMUEL)
August 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS. E-mailed to counsel on 8/21/20 (mbh, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CLEYVIS BODRE. (JL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14505099.), filed by CLEYVIS BODRE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(DION, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BODRE v. SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARP CORPORATION t/a SHARP PACKAGING SOLUTIONS
Represented By: JOANNA M. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: MARLA N. PRESLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEYVIS BODRE
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?