LLOYD v. HILTON GARDEN INN et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN LLOYD
Defendant: DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN and OSMOSE UTILITIES SERVICES INC
Respondent: POST & SCHELL, P.C. and Charles W. Spitz
Case Number: 5:2020cv04070
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
October 12, 2020 Filing 27 Susan Lloyd's Reply to Defendants' Brief in Opposition filed 10/5/20, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Strike #23 Response in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions against Hilton Defendants with certificate of service filed by DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
October 2, 2020 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF SUSAN LLOYD'S MOTION TO STRIKE MEMORANDUM OF THE HILTON DEFENDANTS IN REGARDS TO LLOYD'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED OCTOBER 2, 2020, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fdc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION TO ISSUE SUMMONS OF SERVICE FOR OSMOSE UTILITIES SERVICE, INC., FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Order MOTION for Sanctions, #11 MOTION for Sanctions filed by DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(COHEN, FARA)
September 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO CHANGE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS HILTON GARDEN INN, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP AND DAVID HIRSCH FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT OSMOSE UTILITIES SERVICES, INC. FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD.(fdc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Lloyd's Response to Charles Spitz and Post and Schell Brief in Opposition to Sanctions filed September 16, 2020, Certificate of Service. (NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED)(mbh, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN LLOYD. DAVID HIRSCH waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020; EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020; HILTON GARDEN INN waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 WAIVER, #2 WAIVER, #3 LETTER)(amas, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HILTON GARDEN INN.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN with Certificate of Service(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Order MOTION for Sanctions, #11 MOTION for Sanctions Errata to Respondents' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Sanctions filed by POST & SCHELL, P.C., Charles W. Spitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Priority Mail Envelope, #2 Errata Corrected Memorandum)(MALONE, JAMES)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Susan Lloyd's Response to Charles Spitz and Post and Schell Brief in Opposition to Sanctions, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Order MOTION for Sanctions, #11 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles W. Spitz, POST & SCHELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Form of Order)(MALONE, JAMES)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (fdc)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF 8/31/20 PLAINTIFF SUSAN LLOYD HAVING FILED A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, IT IS ORDERED THAT IF LLOYD SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER PAY $400.00 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. LLOYD MAY USE THE COURT'S FORM APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THIS FORM IS AVAILABLE ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE. ETC. LLOYD'S MOTION TO DISPUTE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES (ECF NO. 6) IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/31/20. 8/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
August 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO WITHDRAW EMERGENCY INJUNCTION FILED ON AUGUST 17, 2020 FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(fdc)
August 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DOCKET PAYMENT OF FILING FEE FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD.(fdc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO CAUSE DEFENDANTS TO CEASE AND DESIST DEFAMATION OF LLOYD AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fdc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISPUTE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES FILED BY SUSAN LLOYD, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218240 (nd, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBITS by SUSAN LLOYD.. (fdc, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS by SUSAN LLOYD.. (fdc, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBITS by SUSAN LLOYD.. (fdc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SUSAN LLOYD. (bw, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID HIRSCH, EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP, HILTON GARDEN INN, OSMOSE UTILITIES SERVICES INC, filed by SUSAN LLOYD. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LLOYD v. HILTON GARDEN INN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HIRSCH
Represented By: FARA ASHLEY COHEN
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLEVIEW CROSSINGS HOTEL LP
Represented By: FARA ASHLEY COHEN
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON GARDEN INN
Represented By: FARA ASHLEY COHEN
Represented By: ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSMOSE UTILITIES SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: POST & SCHELL, P.C.
Represented By: JAMES R. MALONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles W. Spitz
Represented By: JAMES R. MALONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?