SANABRIA v. HELLWIG et al
Petitioner: JASON A. SANABRIER and JASON A. SANABRIA
Respondent: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, APD/MR.SMITH/MR.BLEED and DR GREGORY HELLWIG
Case Number: 5:2020cv04091
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Remark ORDER #8 TOGETHER WITH THE APPLICATION FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS WERE MAILED BY CHAMBERS TO MR. SANABRIA ON 10/15/2020. (sfl, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; denying #7 MOTION TO PRODUCE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/15/2020.10/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (BY CHAMBERS) AND E-MAILED.(sfl, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF JASON A. SANABRIER TO OBTAIN EVIDENCE. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) Modified on 9/24/2020 (dt, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF JASON SANABRIER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) Modified on 9/24/2020 (dt, ).
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Letter dated (not dated) by JASON A. SANABRIER. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (er, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Letter, Exhibits by JASON A. SANABRIER *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
September 14, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #3 WITH IFP FORMS TO PLAINTIFF ON 9/14/20. (jaa, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF MR. SANABRIER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS, EITHER PAY $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MR. SANABRIER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/2/20. 9/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP FORMS; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2020) (bw, ).
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JASON SANABRIER. (md, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APD/MR.SMITH/MR.BLEED, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, GREGORY HELLWIG filed by JASON SANABRIER. *NO FEE. NO IFP* (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(rf, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANABRIA v. HELLWIG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: APD/MR.SMITH/MR.BLEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DR GREGORY HELLWIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JASON A. SANABRIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JASON A. SANABRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?