CROMPTON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ETHAN WAYNE CROMPTON
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 5:2020cv05213
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by ETHAN WAYNE CROMPTON.. (FROELICH, JAMES)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Procedural Order 10/21/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed. (bw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2020: #1 Social Security Standing Procedural Order) (jaa, ).
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
October 21, 2020 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (bw, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14649818.), filed by ETHAN WAYNE CROMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form)(FROELICH, JAMES) Modified on 10/21/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMPTON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHAN WAYNE CROMPTON
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?