BALTHASER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: BRUCE C. BALTHASER
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 5:2020cv06181
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by BRUCE C. BALTHASER.. (FROELICH, JAMES)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING SOCIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.12/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (Attachments: #1 SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEDURAL ORDER)(rf, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA CM/ECF UPON: THE OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHEIF/COUNSEL, REGION III, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION; THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERKS OFFICE WILL ENSURE THAT CM/ECF NOTIFICATIONS INDICATING THAT THE COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED AND SUMMONSES HAVE BEEN ISSUED ARE SENT TO OGC.EDPA.COMPLAINTS@SSA.GOV AND USAPAE.SSACCOMPLAINTS@US.DOJ.GOV... SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 12/9/20. 12/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 9, 2020 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (rf, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by BRUCE C. BALTHASER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by BRUCE C. BALTHASER..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALTHASER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE C. BALTHASER
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?