MOHAMED et al v. ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP et al
Plaintiff: NAHED A. ELSEIFY and MAGDY MOHAMED
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORP. 1-10, ANGEL HERNANDEZ and ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP
Case Number: 5:2020cv06390
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference to be conducted via telephone before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case has been scheduled for WEDNESDAY, MARCH 3, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for all the parties will use dial in number 1-571-353-2300 and use pin 363 973 916# to enter the conference call.(sres, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP, ANGEL HERNANDEZ.(DALY, JOAN)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH. A Telephone Conference held on 1/25/21Not on the Record. (DT)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF RECKLESSNESS, CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AND ALL JOHN DOES AND ABC CORPS. FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Strike Allegations of Recklessness and Claims of Punitive Damages and all John Does by ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP, ANGEL HERNANDEZ. (DALY, JOAN)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON MONDAY, JANUARY 25, 2021, AT 11:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOAN DEVLIN DALY on behalf of ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP, ANGEL HERNANDEZ with Jury Demand(DALY, JOAN)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MAGDY MOHAMED (ZAKOS, STEPHEN)
December 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP and ANGEL HERNANDEZ. E-mailed to counsel on 12/22/20 (mbh, )
December 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NAHED A. ELSEIFY, MAGDY MOHAMED. (JL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14796049.), filed by MAGDY MOHAMED, NAHED ELSEIFY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(ZAKOS, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMED et al v. ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL HERNANDEZ
Represented By: JOAN DEVLIN DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARGAYU 4 EVER TRUCKING GROUP
Represented By: JOAN DEVLIN DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAHED A. ELSEIFY
Represented By: STEPHEN W. ZAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDY MOHAMED
Represented By: STEPHEN W. ZAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?