HOLLIDAY v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HOLLIDAY
Defendant: NURSE LEONA, DR KENNETH WLOCHESKI and PRIME CARE MEDICAL
Case Number: 5:2021cv00314
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT HOLLIDAY'S MOTION FOR STATUS UPDATE IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RESEND A COPY OF EACH OF THE FOLLOWING TO THE UPDATE ADDRESS STATED IN THE MOTION: (a) THE COURT'S 2/16/21 MEMORANDUM (ECF NO.5); (b) THE COURT'S 2/16/21 ORDER (ECF NO.6); (c) A COPY OF THIS ORDER; AND (d) A COMPLETE COPY OF THE UPDATED DOCKET SHEET IN THIS CASE AFTER ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. THE CASE REMAINS CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/19/21.3/19/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE WITH PLEADINGS.(JL )
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 MICHAEL HOLLIDAY MOTION FOR A STATUS UPDATE..(JL )
February 17, 2021 PLEADING #5, #6 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (fdc)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (fdc)
January 28, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE OF PRO SE GUIDELINES #4 MAILED TO HOLLIDAY. (fdc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MICHAEL HOLLIDAY. (bw, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NURSE LEONA, PRIME CARE MEDICAL, KENNETH WLOCHESKI, filed by MICHAEL HOLLIDAY. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL HOLLIDAY..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLIDAY v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HOLLIDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE LEONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR KENNETH WLOCHESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?