BUTLER v. MARKET VIEW, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DIANA BUTLER
Defendant: MARKET VIEW, LLC doing business as DEBTTRADER, NORTHWOOD ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC and VARIOUS JOHN DOES
Case Number: 5:2021cv00424
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIANA BUTLER. MARKET VIEW, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIANA BUTLER. NORTHWOOD ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. GROGAN on behalf of DIANA BUTLER (GROGAN, JOHN)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. NAGDEMAN on behalf of DIANA BUTLER (NAGDEMAN, DAVID)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14879947.), filed by DIANA BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(ACKELSBERG, IRV)
January 29, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIANA BUTLER. (lisad, )
January 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to MARKET VIEW, LLC, NORTHWOOD ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, VARIOUS JOHN DOES. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/29/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTLER v. MARKET VIEW, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET VIEW, LLC doing business as DEBTTRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWOOD ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VARIOUS JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA BUTLER
Represented By: DAVID A. NAGDEMAN
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?