MARKS v. JONES et al
Plaintiff: CURTIS MARKS
Defendant: ALVIN ROWE, ROY JONES, THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC and PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00453
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALVIN ROWE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(PISANO, MATTHEW)
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Alvin Rowe by Certified Mail on 3/10/2021 (HURD, RYAN)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CURTIS MARKS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BOYLAN, KEVIN)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/5/2021 02:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S PERKIN; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/10/21. 3/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/19/2021 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S PERKIN; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 3/10/21. 3/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion for More Definite Statement, Motion to Strike Scandalous Language from the Complaint filed by CURTIS MARKS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BOYLAN, KEVIN)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY,APRIL 13, 2021 AT 3:00 P.M. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A TELECONFERENCE DIAL IN NUMBER AND CODE FOR ALL PARTIES TO CALL AND EMAIL SAME TO CHAMBERS EMAIL: CHAMBERS_OF_JUDGE_JEFFREY_L_SCHMEHL@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R.CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; 2. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; 3. AFTER CONSULTATION WITH COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND SUBMIT THE REQUIRED JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26 (F); 4. COUNSEL SHALL FOLLOW JUDGE SCHMEHLS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES WHICH CAN BE FOUND AT WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/8/21. 3/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/8/21. 3/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC. Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(PISANO, MATTHEW) Modified on 3/5/2021 (tjd).
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW T. PISANO on behalf of ALVIN ROWE, THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC with Jury Demand(PISANO, MATTHEW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , Motion for More Definite Statement, Motion to Strike Scandalous Language from the Complaint filed by ROY JONES, PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(WIMMER, THOMAS)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T. PION on behalf of ROY JONES, PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC with Jury Demand & COS(PION, JOHN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. WIMMER on behalf of ROY JONES, PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC with Jury Demand & COS(WIMMER, THOMAS)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon The Martin Bower Co., LLC by Certified Mail on 2/10/2021 (HURD, RYAN)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Patterson Companies, LLC by Certified Mail on 2/9/2021 (HURD, RYAN)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Roy Jones by Certified Mail on 2/6/2021 (HURD, RYAN)
February 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to ROY JONES, PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC, ALVIN ROWE, THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/2/21 (jaa, )
February 1, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CURTIS MARKS. (tjd)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN D. HURD on behalf of CURTIS MARKS with Certificate of Service(HURD, RYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROY JONES, PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC, ALVIN ROWE, THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14883317.), filed by CURTIS MARKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(BOYLAN, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARKS v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVIN ROWE
Represented By: MATTHEW T. PISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY JONES
Represented By: JOHN T. PION
Represented By: THOMAS A. WIMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MARTIN BROWER CO., LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW T. PISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTERSON COMPANIES, LLC
Represented By: JOHN T. PION
Represented By: THOMAS A. WIMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS MARKS
Represented By: RYAN D. HURD
Represented By: KEVIN CLANCY BOYLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?