CARPENTER
In Re: DAVID CARPENTER
Case Number: 5:2021cv00822
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by DAVID CARPENTER. Envelope. (va, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 2/26/21. 2/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by DAVID CARPENTER.. (va, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by DAVID CARPENTER. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: DAVID CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?