CANON INC. v. THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC
Plaintiff: CANON INC.
Defendant: THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC and THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2021cv01099
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF 4/14/21 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY THIS LITIGATION PENDING A U.S. INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION INVESTIGATION (ECF NO.8),IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ACTION ARE HEREBY STAYED PENDING A FINAL RESOLUTION. INCLUDING ALL APPEALS, OF THE PENDING ITC INVESTIGATION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORTS EVERY 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ADVISING THE COURT OF THE STATUS OF THE PENDING ITC INVESTIGATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/14/21. 4/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC..(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation filed by THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 4/5/21 THAT THE TIME FOR THE SUPPLIES GUYS TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED 60 DAYS THROUGH AND INCLUDING JUNE 11, 2021. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/5/21. 4/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC. (HOFFMAN, BONNIE)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Richard Kreitzer of First Legal re: served Summons, First Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, and Designation Form upon Cindy Wenger, Authorized Employee of InCorp Services, Inc., Registered Agent of The Supplies Guys, Inc. by Personal Service on March 22, 2021 (KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC., filed by CANON INC., Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit 1 (667 Patent Claim Chart), #5 Exhibit 2 (060 Patent Claim Chart), #6 Exhibit 3 (061 Patent Claim Chart), #7 Exhibit 4 (957 Patent Claim Chart), #8 Exhibit 5 (814 Patent Claim Chart), #9 Exhibit 6 (032 Patent Claim Chart), #10 Exhibit 7 (033 Patent Claim Chart), #11 Exhibit 8 (654 Patent Claim Chart), #12 Exhibit 9 (881 Patent Claim Chart), #13 Exhibit 10 (882 Patent Claim Chart))(KELLEHER, JOSEPH) Modified on 3/19/2021 (md, ).
March 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/19/21 (bw, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Report Of the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by CANON INC.. (KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CANON INC..(KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14964754.), filed by CANON INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit 1 (667 Patent Claim Chart), #5 Exhibit 2 (060 Patent Claim Chart), #6 Exhibit 3 (061 Patent Claim Chart), #7 Exhibit 4 (957 Patent Claim Chart), #8 Exhibit 5 (814 Patent Claim Chart), #9 Exhibit 6 (032 Patent Claim Chart), #10 Exhibit 7 (033 Patent Claim Chart), #11 Exhibit 8 (654 Patent Claim Chart), #12 Exhibit 9 (881 Patent Claim Chart), #13 Exhibit 10 (882 Patent Claim Chart))(KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
March 8, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CANON INC.. (lisad, )
March 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/8/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANON INC. v. THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SUPPLIES GUYS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SUPPLIES GUYS, INC.
Represented By: BONNIE M. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANON INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?