PEREZ v. PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC
Plaintiff: REINARDO PEREZ
Defendant: PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv02081
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JULY 20, 2021, AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(WOLFE, AUSTIN)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC.(WOLFE, AUSTIN)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by AUSTIN W. WOLFE on behalf of PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC with Certificate of Service(WOLFE, AUSTIN)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SCHAUN D. HENRY on behalf of PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC with Certificate of Service(HENRY, SCHAUN)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REINARDO PEREZ. PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC waiver sent on 5/6/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (WARD, JOSHUA)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/6/21. 5/6/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(er, )
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15102496.), filed by REINARDO PEREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(WARD, JOSHUA)
May 6, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by REINARDO PEREZ. (md, )
May 6, 2021 Summons Issued as to PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/6/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEREZ v. PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REINARDO PEREZ
Represented By: JOSHUA P. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO MAX FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: AUSTIN W. WOLFE
Represented By: SCHAUN D. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?