Wabote v. Ude
Plaintiff: Simbi Kesiyi Wabote
Defendant: Jackson Ude
Case Number: 5:2021cv02214
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Simbi Kesiyi Wabote by Jackson Ude., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT DEFENSE COUNSELS MOTION FOR A WAIVER OF THE SPONSOR REQUIREMENT, SEE ECF NO. #12 , IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/8/21.7/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION BY ATTORNEY BENNETH O. AMADI FOR THE WAIVER OF A SPONSORS TO HIS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT AND TO REPRESENT DEFENDANT IN THIS CASE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBIT filed by Jackson Ude.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE #10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ISGRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/28/21.6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15218111.) filed by Simbi Kesiyi Wabote..(MACEL, JOSHUA)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND GRANTED IN PART AND DISAPPROVED AND DENIED IN PART; AND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ONLY, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE, IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING JULY 12, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/28/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENNETH O AMADI on behalf of Jackson Ude (rf, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to all Parties that a review of the Courts records indicates that Defendant has failed to timely respond to the Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to take action to have a default entered against Defendant pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) within ten (10) days of the date of this Notice, the Court may enter an Order dismissing the Complaint for lack of prosecution. (mas, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simbi Kesiyi Wabote (MACEL, JOSHUA)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Jackson Ude AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (rf, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF_DAVID D. LIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/19/21. 5/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP. E-MAILED.(er, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David D. Lin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15130712.) filed by Simbi Kesiyi Wabote.Certificate of Service.(MACEL, JOSHUA)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jackson Ude, filed by Simbi Kesiyi Wabote. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(MACEL, JOSHUA)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/17/21. 5/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Civil Cover Sheet and Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (tjd)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson Ude ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15123663.), filed by Simbi Kesiyi Wabote.(MACEL, JOSHUA) Modified on 5/14/2021 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wabote v. Ude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simbi Kesiyi Wabote
Represented By: JOSHUA DAVID MACEL
Represented By: DAVID D. LIN
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CILENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Ude
Represented By: BENNETH O AMADI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?