SPARK ORTHODONTICS v. ORMCO CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SPARK ORTHODONTICS, SPARK DSO, LLC and SPARK ORTHODONTICS, P.C.
Defendant: ORMCO CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2021cv02841
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ORMCO CORPORATION, filed by SPARK DSO, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(WERNER, GEORGE) Modified on 7/26/2021 (md, ).
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SPARK ORTHODONTICS. ORMCO CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (WERNER, GEORGE)
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to ORMCO CORPORATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/30/21 (bw, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ORMCO CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15215955.), filed by SPARK ORTHODONTICS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(ANASTASI, SALVATORE) Modified on 6/28/2021 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPARK ORTHODONTICS v. ORMCO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORMCO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARK ORTHODONTICS
Represented By: SALVATORE ANASTASI
Represented By: GEORGE C. WERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARK DSO, LLC
Represented By: GEORGE C. WERNER
Represented By: SALVATORE ANASTASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARK ORTHODONTICS, P.C.
Represented By: GEORGE C. WERNER
Represented By: SALVATORE ANASTASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?