LUCKETT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JAMES LUCKETT
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION doing business as CONRAIL SHARED ASSETS
Case Number: 5:2021cv02863
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 20109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Rule 16 Conference in the above-captioned matter in Chambers before Judge John M. Gallagher on Tuesday, September 14, 2021 at 10:00 AM, (ECF No. 6) is Cancelled. Lead counsel shall appear VIA TELEPHONE for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, September 14, 2021 at 10:00 AM, by providing a calling bridge to the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, September 6, 2021. (er, ) Modified on 8/11/2021 (er, ).
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, September 14, 2021 at 10:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 16 Conference Information Report no later than Monday, September 6, 2021. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Timothy R. Rice. (mas, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CSX Corporation and Norfolk Southern Corporation with Certificate of Service by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION.(SIRBAK, JOSEPH)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, with Additional Defenses by CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION.(SIRBAK, JOSEPH)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE A. KATZ on behalf of JAMES LUCKETT (KATZ, LAWRENCE)
July 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/21/21 (bw, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, filed by JAMES LUCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track form)(MYERS, ROBERT)
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/30/21 (jaa, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15218403.), filed by JAMES LUCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management form)(MYERS, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCKETT v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION doing business as CONRAIL SHARED ASSETS
Represented By: JOSEPH P. SIRBAK, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LUCKETT
Represented By: ROBERT E. MYERS
Represented By: LAWRENCE A. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?