SAMPEDRO et al v. Telfair, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BRENDA LYNN GEIGER, ROSA ACOSTA, Vida Guerra, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO and IESHA MARIE CRESPO
Defendant: Telfair, Inc. doing business as Maingate Nightclub and Dominic Germano
Case Number: 5:2021cv02977
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by Telfair, Inc..(STEERE, CHRISTINE)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Denise Hinkle re: served Summons and Complaint upon Telfair, Inc. d/b/a Maingate Nightclub by personal service on July 22, 2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY) Modified on 8/27/2021 (md, ).
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Denise Hinkle re: served Summons and Complaint upon Dominic Germano by personal service on July 22, 2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY) Modified on 8/27/2021 (md, ).
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 7, 2021, AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dominic Germano, Telfair, Inc..(STEERE, CHRISTINE)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE D. STEERE on behalf of Dominic Germano, Telfair, Inc. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STEERE, CHRISTINE)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRI MARCEL on behalf of Dominic Germano, Telfair, Inc. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MARCEL, HENRI)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/9/21. 7/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
July 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to Dominic Germano, Telfair, Inc.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/7/21 (JL )
July 2, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROSA ACOSTA, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, BRENDA LYNN GEIGER, Vida Guerra, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO. (JL )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15231945.), filed by CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, ROSA ACOSTA, IESHA MARIE CRESPO, BRENDA LYNN GEIGER, Vida Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover, #2 Designation Form Designation, #3 Exhibit A-E)(WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAMPEDRO et al v. Telfair, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telfair, Inc. doing business as Maingate Nightclub
Represented By: CHRISTINE D. STEERE
Represented By: HENRI MARCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Germano
Represented By: CHRISTINE D. STEERE
Represented By: HENRI MARCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA LYNN GEIGER
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA ACOSTA
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Guerra
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IESHA MARIE CRESPO
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?