POTEAT v. LYDON et al
Plaintiff: ANTOINE POTEAT
Defendant: GERALD LYDON, CHAD LABOUR, NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH, JUSTIN JULIUS, GREGORY EMERY, BRIAN KONOPKA, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, HEATHER GALLAGUER, BETHANY ZAMPOGNA, JOSEPH STAUFFER, JAMES MARTIN, JARED HANNA, EDWARD RESSLER and LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Case Number: 5:2021cv03117
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH STAUFFER, HEATHER GALLAGUER, JAMES MARTIN, EDWARD RESSLER, JARED HANNA, BETHANY ZAMPOGNA. JOSEPH STAUFFER waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; HEATHER GALLAGUER waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; JAMES MARTIN waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; EDWARD RESSLER waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; JARED HANNA waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; BETHANY ZAMPOGNA waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (CIPOLETTI, LISA) Modified on 8/27/2021 (md, ).
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGORY EMERY, CHAD LABOUR, BRIAN KONOPKA, GERALD LYDON, NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH, JUSTIN JULIUS. GREGORY EMERY waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; CHAD LABOUR waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; BRIAN KONOPKA waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; GERALD LYDON waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; JUSTIN JULIUS waiver sent on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (KAPLAN, SARINA)
August 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by SARINA M. KAPLAN on behalf of GREGORY EMERY, NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH, JUSTIN JULIUS, BRIAN KONOPKA, CHAD LABOUR, GERALD LYDON with Certificate of Service(KAPLAN, SARINA)
August 20, 2021 (ISSUED IN ERROR) Summons Issued as to LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE. Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE on 8/20/21 (dt, ) Modified on 8/26/2021 (dt, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA R. CIPOLETTI on behalf of HEATHER GALLAGUER, JARED HANNA, JAMES MARTIN, EDWARD RESSLER, JOSEPH STAUFFER, BETHANY ZAMPOGNA with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(CIPOLETTI, LISA)
July 21, 2021 PLEADING #4 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 Notice to Plaintiff ANTOINE POTEAT. RE: Waiver of Service. (DT)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Edward Ressler on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jared Hanna on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to James Martin on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joseph Stauffer on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bethany Zampogna on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Heather Gallaguer on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Pennsylvania State Police on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Brian Konopka on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gregory Emery on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Justin Julius on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nicholas Goldsmith on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Chad Labour on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gerald Lydon on 7/20/21 by ANTOINE POTEAT. Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2021. (dt)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF 7/20/21 THAT PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS SPECIFICALLY APOPINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ONT HE DEFENDANTS ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/20/21. 7/20/21 ENTERED. (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) (DT) Modified on 7/20/2021 (dt, ).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF 7/15/21 THAT IF POTEAT SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER PAY THE $402 FILING FEE OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE POTEAT WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ETC. IF POTEAT FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (DT)
July 15, 2021 PLEADING #2 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
July 15, 2021 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT filed by ANTOINE POTEAT. (Filing Fee $402, APE005560 (Filing fee $ 402.) (mas, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREGORY EMERY, HEATHER GALLAGUER, NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH, JARED HANNA, JUSTIN JULIUS, BRIAN KONOPKA, CHAD LABOUR, LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, GERALD LYDON, JAMES MARTIN, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, EDWARD RESSLER, JOSEPH STAUFFER, BETHANY ZAMPOGNA, filed by ANTOINE POTEAT. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POTEAT v. LYDON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINE POTEAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD LYDON
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD LABOUR
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS GOLDSMITH
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN JULIUS
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY EMERY
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN KONOPKA
Represented By: SARINA M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER GALLAGUER
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHANY ZAMPOGNA
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH STAUFFER
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MARTIN
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED HANNA
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD RESSLER
Represented By: LISA R. CIPOLETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?