Hanson v. Lehigh County District Attorney Office et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hanson
Defendant: LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE and JAMES MARTIN
Case Number: 5:2021cv03368
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Hanson. USCA Case Number 21-2763 (amas, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher Hanson. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (FEE NOT PAID, NO IFP FILED) (amas, )
September 3, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NOS. 13 AND 14 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HANSON. (bw, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE HANSON'S MOTION FOR COUNSEL AND MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ARE DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/1/21. 9/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/1/21. 9/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT, FILED BY CHRISTOPHER HANSON. (amas, )
August 12, 2021 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT by Christopher Hanson. PPE230803 (Filing Fee $402, (Filing fee $ 402.) (jaa, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/10/21. 8/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
August 10, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 11 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HANSON. (bw, )
August 2, 2021 DOC. NO. 10 MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (ems)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT HANSON'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED. IF HANSON SEEKS TO PROCEED WWITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL REMIT $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IN THE EVENT HANSON PAYS THE FEES, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONSES UNTIL SO ORDERED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/30/21. 7/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
July 30, 2021 Remark Pro Se Guidelines Mailed to Christopher Hanson (DT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-01261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #6 Report and Recommendations to the following extent: The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the file on this case within the Middle District of Pennsylvania. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the plaintiff's complaint be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and 1406. (See R&R for complete details.) Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 7/20/21. (ki) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/Brief to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Hanson.(lp) Modified on 7/20/2021 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher Hanson. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Hanson.(lp) Modified on 7/20/2021 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lehigh County District Attorney Office, James Martin lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Christopher Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Plaintiff Cover Letter)(lp) Modified on 7/20/2021 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Lehigh County District Attorney Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?