STROUP et al v. SAM'S WEST, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRANDON STROUP and JESSICA STROUP
Defendant: SAM'S WEST, INC. doing business as SAM'S CLUB and WALMART, INC.
Case Number: 5:2021cv03442
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with to Plaintiff's Complaint by SAM'S WEST, INC., WALMART, INC..(ONLY, LISA)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA M. ONLY on behalf of SAM'S WEST, INC., WALMART, INC. with Certificate of Service(ONLY, LISA)
August 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to SAM'S WEST, INC., WALMART, INC. Summons E-mailed To: Counsel on 8/5/21. (er, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/4/21. 8/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Stroup, Brandon against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15310171.), filed by BRANDON STROUP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SWARTZ, BRANDON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STROUP et al v. SAM'S WEST, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON STROUP
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA STROUP
Represented By: BRANDON A. SWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM'S WEST, INC. doing business as SAM'S CLUB
Represented By: LISA M. ONLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: LISA M. ONLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?