HEIMBACH v. HILL
Plaintiff: JUSTIN C. HEIMBACH
Defendant: RONALD HILL
Case Number: 5:2021cv03964
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 BLANK COPY OF COMPLAINT FORM BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER MAILED TO PRO SE ON 10/18/21. (lisad, )
October 15, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NOS. 5 AND 6 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, CERTAIN CLAIMS IN THE COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND OTHER CLAIMS ARE DIMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND HEIMBACH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/14/21. 10/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/14/21. 10/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 13, 2021 Signed IFP Motion and Complaint attached to doc nos. 1 and 2. (mbh, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THE UNSIGNED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 2) AND APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 1) TO HEIMBACH. IF HEIMBACH SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL SIGN THE COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. HEIMBACH'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF A HANDWRITTEN SIGNATURE. IF HEIMBACH SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL ALSO SIGN THE COPY OF THE APPLICATION AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF HEIMBACH FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 9/8/21.9/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS.(mbh, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against RONALD HILL, filed by JUSTIN C. HEIMBACH.(bw, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JUSTIN C. HEIMBACH..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEIMBACH v. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN C. HEIMBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?