CLARK v. KREMUS
Plaintiff: SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.
Defendant: JAMES KREMUS
Case Number: 5:2021cv04049
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 PLEADING #5,#6 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR., # 0205753, SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OFLEHIGH COUNTY JAIL; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, MR.CLARKS FEDERAL CONSTITUTIONAL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMES KREMUS AREDISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ALL STATE LAW CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OFSUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/28/2021. 9/28/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. E-MAILED TO WARDEN.(sg, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/28/2021. 9/28/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
September 10, 2021 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, CLARK (bw, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR. (bw, ) Modified on 9/10/2021 (bw, ).
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JAMES KREMUS, filed by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.(bw, ) Modified on 9/10/2021 (bw, ).
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR..(bw, ) Modified on 9/10/2021 (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. KREMUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY TYRONE CLARK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KREMUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?