SYLVA v. Ude
Plaintiff: TIMIPRE SYLVA
Defendant: Jackson Ude
Case Number: 5:2021cv04102
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jackson Ude.MOTION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Requested By Defendant in his Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Claims)(AMADI, BENNETH)
November 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jackson Ude.MOTION AND MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A-D In Support of Motion)(AMADI, BENNETH)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BENNETH O. AMADI, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/2/21.11/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15517044.) filed by Jackson Ude..(ABIONA, OLUGBENGA)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Benneth O. Amadi filed by Jackson Ude.Declaration of Counsel.(ABIONA, OLUGBENGA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by OLUGBENGA O. ABIONA on behalf of Jackson Ude with Certificate of Service(ABIONA, OLUGBENGA)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, ECF NO. 9, IS GRANTED IN PART. DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL, BENNETH ONYEMA AMADI, MUST FILE A PRO HAC VICE MOTION IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE AND PAY THE NECESSARY FEE IN ORDER TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT IN THIS CASE. SINCE MR. AMADI, HAD NOT YET BEEN ADMITTED TO PRACTICE BEFORE THIS COURT IN THIS CASE WHEN HE FILED A MOTION TO DISMISS, THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 10, IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 3, 2021, THE DEFENDANT, EITHER PRO SE OR THROUGH PROPERLY ADMITTED COUNSEL, SHALL REFILE HIS MOTION TO DISMISS OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/26/21.10/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 Letter dated 10-25-2021 by Jackson Ude. (AMADI, BENNETH)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 Letter dated October 25, 2021 by TIMIPRE SYLVA. (CILENTO, MICHAEL)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/22/21. 10/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER, TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., AS RELATED TO SIMBI KESIYI WABOTE V. JACKSON UDE, CIVIL ACTION NO.: 21-CV-2214. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/21/21. 10/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jackson Ude. (AMADI, BENNETH)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jackson Ude.MOTION AND MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Claims, #2 Exhibit A to D In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Claims, #3 Text of Proposed Order To the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Claims)(AMADI, BENNETH)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Clarification filed by Jackson Ude.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AMADI, BENNETH)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENNETH ONYEMA AMADI on behalf of Jackson Ude (AMADI, BENNETH)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mark S. Gibson, PA State Constable re: served Summons upon Jackson Ude by Personal on 09/28/2021 (MACEL, JOSHUA)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THE APPLICATION OF, MICHAEL D. CILENTO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS: GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/29/21.9/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(er, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID D. LIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/29/21.9/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO UNREP) AND E-MAILED.(er, )
September 30, 2021 DOC. 6 MAILED TO UNREP. (sg, )
September 30, 2021 DOC. 5 MAILED TO UNREP. (sg, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Cilento ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15438352.) filed by TIMIPRE SYLVA.Application for Admission - Pro Hac Vice.(MACEL, JOSHUA)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David D. Lin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15438326.) filed by TIMIPRE SYLVA.Application for Admission - Pro Hac Vice.(MACEL, JOSHUA)
September 21, 2021 Summons as to amended complaint Issued as to Jackson Ude. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/21/21 (bw, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jackson Ude, filed by TIMIPRE SYLVA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MACEL, JOSHUA)
September 16, 2021 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, )
September 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to Jackson Ude. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/16/21 (bw, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson Ude ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15408581.), filed by TIMIPRE SYLVA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MACEL, JOSHUA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SYLVA v. Ude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMIPRE SYLVA
Represented By: JOSHUA DAVID MACEL
Represented By: DAVID D. LIN
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CILENTO, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Ude
Represented By: BENNETH ONYEMA AMADI
Represented By: OLUGBENGA O. ABIONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?