KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION v. SPORTSENGINE, INC.
Plaintiff: KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: SPORTSENGINE, INC.
Case Number: 5:2021cv04268
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF 11/19/21 THAT PLAINTFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME PURSAUNT TO FRCP 6(h) IS GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATIONS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO SPORTS ENGINE'S MOTIONTO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS (DOC 9) SHALL BE CONSIDERED AS TIMELY FILED ON NOVEMBER 8, 2021. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 11/19/21. 11/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIEFEL, JOHN)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by SPORTSENGINE, INC.. (HAZLETT, THOMAS)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KIEFEL, JOHN)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by SPORTSENGINE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Libby Kohlbeck)(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by SPORTSENGINE, INC... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand filed by KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(KIEFEL, JOHN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John H. Kiefel re: served Notice to Plead, Complaint and Exhibits upon Defendant SportsEngine Inc by Express Mail Return Receipt Requested on 09/28/2021 (KIEFEL, JOHN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Lehigh County. (sg, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS W. HAZLETT on behalf of SPORTSENGINE, INC. with Certificate of Service(HAZLETT, THOMAS)
September 30, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SPORTSENGINE, INC.**(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #2 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**.(tjd)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by SPORTSENGINE, INC.. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPORTSENGINE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15439664), filed by SPORTSENGINE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION v. SPORTSENGINE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYSTONE REGIONAL VOLLEYBALL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN H. KIEFEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPORTSENGINE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. GALLAGHER, IV
Represented By: THOMAS W. HAZLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?