RODRIGUEZ-OUIJANO v. WELSH et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO
Defendant: GLENN D. WELSH, AMY J. LITVINOV, BRIAN McBETH, STEPHANIC LOUISE NOCERA, BRANDON BAUMANN, KIRBY S. GORDON, CHRISTIAN Y. LEINBACH, KEVIN S. BARNHARDT and MICHAEL S. RIVERA
Case Number: 5:2021cv04804
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 272.24, receipt number PPE234761 (jaa, )
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #7 PRO SE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR HIM TO TIMELY PURSUE POTENTIAL STATE LAW CLAIMS IN STATE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/2/21.12/2/21 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(fdc)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO.(fdc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MR. RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-HOUTZDALE. THE COMPLAINT #3 IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED. MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (fdc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED. MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (fdc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (5 & 6) FAXED TO SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-HOUTZDALE. (fdc)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order PLEADING #4 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dt, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/2/2021) (dt, ).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against KEVIN S. BARNHARDT, BRANDON BAUMANN, KIRBY S. GORDON, CHRISTIAN Y. LEINBACH, AMY J. LITVINOV, BRIAN McBETH, STEPHANIC LOUISE NOCERA, MICHAEL S. RIVERA, GLENN D. WELSH, filed by JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO.(dt, ) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)Modified on 11/2/2021 (dt, ). Modified on 11/2/2021 (dt, ).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (dt, ) Modified on 11/2/2021 (dt, ). Modified on 11/2/2021 (dt, ).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)(DT) Modified on 11/2/2021 (dt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ-OUIJANO v. WELSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN RODRIGUEZ-QUIJANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN D. WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY J. LITVINOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN McBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIC LOUISE NOCERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON BAUMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRBY S. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN Y. LEINBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN S. BARNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL S. RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?