TRAVIS v. v. STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KRISTINA TRAVIS
Defendant: STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, JANE DOES 1-10 and STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. doing business as STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANIES
Case Number: 5:2021cv05395
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(TASICH, VLADA)
February 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James Gaughan, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15707196.) filed by MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC..Certificate of Service.(TASICH, VLADA)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY AND MODIFY THE CASE CAPTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/3/22. 2/3/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Dismiss State Auto Insurance Company and Modify the Case Caption by MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (TASICH, VLADA)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin Fay re: served Summons and Complaint upon MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY by via certified mail restricted delivery on 12/28/2021 (FAY, KEVIN)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH J. GRUNFELD on behalf of KRISTINA TRAVIS with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GRUNFELD, KENNETH)
January 6, 2022 PAPER #7 MAILED TO UNREP (JL )
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. AND MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER OR A MOTION UNDER RULE 12 UNTIL FEBRUARY 4, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/5/22. 1/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO UNREP), E-MAILED.(er, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by VLADA TASICH on behalf of MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (TASICH, VLADA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin Fay re: served Summons and Complaint upon State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, Inc by via certified mail restricted delivery on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (FAY, KEVIN) Modified on 1/3/2022 (tjd).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin Fay re: served Summons and Complaint upon State Auto Insurance Company by via certified mail restricted delivery on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (FAY, KEVIN) Modified on 1/3/2022 (tjd).
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin Fay re: served Summons and Complaint upon JANE DOES 1-10 by via certified mail restricted delivery on 12/14/2021 (FAY, KEVIN)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Designation Form by KRISTINA TRAVIS.. (FAY, KEVIN) Modified on 12/14/2021 (tjd).
December 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. E-Mail Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/9/21. (er, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15600311.), filed by KRISTINA TRAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(FAY, KEVIN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2021) (sbt, ).
December 9, 2021 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVIS v. v. STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINA TRAVIS
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM FAY
Represented By: KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: VLADA TASICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. doing business as STATE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANIES
Represented By: VLADA TASICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?