KARNGBAYE v. HARRY et al
Petitioner: DECEE KARNGBAYE
Respondent: LAUREL HARRY and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 5:2021cv05667
Filed: December 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number ppe237057 (rf, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by DECEE KARNGBAYE OF ELECTION (JL)
January 24, 2022 DOC. 4 MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS. (sg)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FURNISH KARNGBAYE WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF KARNGBAYE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER (1) PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR (2) COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF PRISON ASSETS SIGNED BY A PRISON OFFICIAL TO THE CLERK OF COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/21/22. 1/21/22 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS.(JL)
January 4, 2022 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, KARNGBAYE. (bw, )
December 24, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dt, )
December 24, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST BY PRO SE DECEE KARNGBAYE FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WITH HIS SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) Modified on 1/3/2022 (dt, ). (dt, ).
December 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DEECEE KARNGBAYE. No Filing Fee/No IFP filed. (dt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2022: #1 Memorandum in support) (dt, ). Modified on 1/3/2022 (tjd). Modified on 1/3/2022 (dt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARNGBAYE v. HARRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DECEE KARNGBAYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LAUREL HARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?