REPASH et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JESSE REPASH, DEBORAH REPASH and KATELYN REPASH
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2022cv00024
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE COMPLETED BY MAY 24, 2022; AND A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON MAY 4, 2022, AT 3:30 P.M. THE PARTIES SHALL DIAL IN TO THE CONFERENCE AT 888-204-5984 AND USE ACCESS CODE 3221457. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/24/22. 2/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/22. (mas)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of DEBORAH REPASH, JESSE REPASH (KOVALSKY, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2022 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Grolnick on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Grolnick, Robert)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2022 AT 11:30 A.M. COUNSEL SHALL USE DIAL IN NUMBER 888-204-5984 ACCESS CODE 3221457. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R.CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; 2. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; 3. AFTER CONSULTATION WITH COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND SUBMIT THE REQUIRED JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26 (F); 4. COUNSEL SHALL FOLLOW JUDGE SCHMEHLS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES WHICH CAN BE FOUND AT WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/10/22. 1/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/10/22. 1/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCHUGH, PATRICK)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MCHUGH, PATRICK)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCHUGH, PATRICK)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15641375), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCHUGH, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPASH et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE REPASH
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH REPASH
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATELYN REPASH
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK R. MCHUGH
Represented By: Robert T. Grolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?