KREIDER et al v. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: LAURIE KREIDER and KEITH KREIDER
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO. and LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2022cv00047
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter and to Strike Demand for Attorneys' Fees and Extra-Contractual Damages filed by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ALFORD, BRIGID)
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter and to Strike Demand for Attorneys' Fees and Extra-Contractual Damages filed by KEITH KREIDER, LAURIE KREIDER. (CAMPBELL, ZACHARY)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter and to Strike Demand for Attorneys' Fees and Extra-Contractual Damages filed by KEITH KREIDER, LAURIE KREIDER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, ZACHARY)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF 2/10/22 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE JOINT STIPULATION TO CORRECT NAME OF DEFENDANT IS APPROVED THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO AMEND THE CASE CAPTION TO REFLECT THAT THE CORRECT NAME OF THE DEFENDANT IS LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 2/10/22. 2/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Correct Name of Defendant by LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO.. (ALFORD, BRIGID)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO..(ALFORD, BRIGID)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter and to Strike Demand for Attorneys' Fees and Extra-Contractual Damages filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO..Brief, COS, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(ALFORD, BRIGID)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaivya Singh on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(Singh, Shaivya)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGID QUINN ALFORD on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(ALFORD, BRIGID)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 1/7/22. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 1/7/22. 1/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
January 6, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KEITH KREIDER, LAURIE KREIDER. (JL)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15646648.), filed by LAURIE KREIDER, KEITH KREIDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation form)(CAMPBELL, ZACHARY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/7/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KREIDER et al v. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE KREIDER
Represented By: ZACHARY D. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH KREIDER
Represented By: ZACHARY D. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL GENERAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: BRIGID QUINN ALFORD
Represented By: Shaivya Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIGID QUINN ALFORD
Represented By: Shaivya Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?