ERAZO v. KIJAKAZI, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: GLENDA ERAZO
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 5:2022cv00820
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2 of 3, #2 Appendix Part 3 of 3)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by GLENDA ERAZO.. (MANNICCI, LORI)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (va)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 3/7/22. Entered and copies e-mailed. (va)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/7/22. 3/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (va)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBIT Designation Form by GLENDA ERAZO.. (MANNICCI, LORI)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Service Alternative filed by Glenda Erazo..(MANNICCI, LORI)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glenda Erazo.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNICCI, LORI)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Glenda Erazo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MANNICCI, LORI)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Completed Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERAZO v. KIJAKAZI, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA ERAZO
Represented By: LORI L. MANNICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?