FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC v. PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC
Defendant: PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 5:2022cv02181
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., filed by FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BOWMAN, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC. All Defendants. (BOWMAN, MICHAEL)
June 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by H. DAVID SEIDMAN on behalf of PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(SEIDMAN, H.)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/6/22. 6/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/3/22 (er)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15962290.), filed by FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BOWMAN, MICHAEL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/3/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC v. PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRESIDE LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL A. BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: H. DAVID SEIDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?